Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Accountability Program - Assessments (More Learning, Less Testing Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Atterbeary, Barkley, D. Barnes, Beidle, Carey, Cullison, Ebersole, Gaines, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hixson, Knotts, Korman, Lam, Morales, Patterson, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and Tarlau
Status
Veto sustained (0-140)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop, in collaboration with specified entities and individuals, a specified middle school level social studies assessment for implementation in the 2019-2020 school year; requiring the State Board, in collaboration with specified entities and individuals, to redesign the high school level social studies assessment for implementation in the 2018-2019 school year; requiring specified county boards to establish on or before specified dates a District Committee on Assessments; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0452
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {545869/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {784631/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-140)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Accountability Program - Assessments (Less Testing, More Learning Act of 2017)
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments {545869/1 Adopted 33
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Text - Third - Education - Accountability Program - Assessments (Less Testing, More Learning Act of 2017)
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 35
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 34
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {784631/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Accountability Program - Assessments (More Learning, Less Testing Act of 2017)
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Veto sustained (0-140)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM