Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Regulation (Private Nonprofit Institution of Higher Education Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, B. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Boyce, Brooks, Cardin, Chang, Ebersole, Feldmark, Hill, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Korman, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Smith, Stein, Stewart, Sydnor, Terrasa, Valderrama, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to determine whether a reportable incident constitutes private inurement if a private nonprofit institution of higher education engages in a reportable incident; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0400
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Regulation (Private Nonprofit Institution of Higher Education Protection Act of 2019)
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Regulation (Private Nonprofit Institution of Higher Education Protection Act of 2019)
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Text - Chapter - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Regulation (Private Nonprofit Institution of Higher Education Protection Act of 2019)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 11-407.1 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:23 AM