Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Bromwell, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, Gaines, Ghrist, Glass, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the statutory minimum grant to Baltimore City, payable from the State's share of the proceeds of Program Open Space, for projects that meet park purposes and are related to Program Open Space; requiring the Governor to include in the budget bill for fiscal year 2018 a general fund appropriation in the amount of $5,000,000 to the Maryland Agricultural and Resource-Based Industry Development Corporation; reducing transfers from a specified special fund to the General Fund of the State for fiscal years 2017 and 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0383
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504968/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Ghrist) {653221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {449239/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable with Amendments {504968/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Ghrist) {653221/1 Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {449239/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 56
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Passed Enrolled 58A
Post Passage 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM