Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Body-Worn Camera Policy
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to include in certain policies requirements that a body-worn camera purchased or otherwise procured for use by a law enforcement officer on or after January 1, 2020, have certain video redaction software and automatically record and save 2 minutes of certain audio and video footage and that a law enforcement officer who is issued a body-worn camera activate the camera at the time of dispatch.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0539
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Body-Worn Camera Policy
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-511.1 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:23 AM