Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurant Food Sales Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz, Ghrist, and Jacobs
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering, for a restaurant with a Class B license in Queen Anne's County, the minimum percentage of the average daily gross receipts that must be from the sale of food from 51% to 25%; altering certain statements regarding gross receipts from food sales in a restaurant that must be made by an applicant for or a holder of a Class B license at certain times; and authorizing the Board to revoke a license of a license holder who fails to maintain gross receipts from food sales of least 25% of gross receipts during any 6-month period.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurant Food Sales Requirements
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 27-101, 27-102, 27-902 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:51 PM