Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elementary School Students - Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a public school student in elementary school to be provided a daily program of physical activity totaling 150 minutes each week to include physical education, and developmentally appropriate, moderate-to-vigorous activity, including recess; requiring that the program of physical activity for a specified category of student be consistent with a specified plan for the student; requiring public elementary schools to designate a specified group to plan and coordinate specified activities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0247 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205, 7-409 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM