Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Use of Utility and Telecommunications Infrastructure
Sponsored by
Delegates Krimm and Mautz
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the initiation of a proceeding at the Public Service Commission regarding the joint use of utility and telecommunications infrastructure; authorizing the Commission to order a joint use entity to allow joint use and reasonable compensation for joint use of certain infrastructure; clarifying the jurisdiction of the Commission over certain entities; and requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Joint Use of Utility and Telecommunications Infrastructure
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Joint Use of Utility and Telecommunications Infrastructure
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
(   8-701 through 8-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page