Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Attar, and Bridges
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to determine the salary of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore City; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to determine the pension of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore City; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0714
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:21 AM