Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, Arentz, Grammer, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an employee of a public body from creating or maintaining government e-mail by using a personal e-mail account; requiring an employee of a public body, under specified circumstances, to forward government e-mail to the official e-mail account of the employee within 5 days after the government e-mail is received; requiring each public body to retain government e-mail for a minimum of 7 years or, under specified circumstances, permanently; requiring the State Archivist to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0155
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2016 3/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4.5-101 through 4.5-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM