Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   HB0514 - 2020RS
   CH0024 - 2021RS
Title
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Qi, Acevero, Boyce, Buckel, Crutchfield, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hettleman, R. Lewis, Lierman, McComas, Palakovich Carr, Smith, Solomon, Valderrama, Walker, B. Barnes, Boteler, C. Branch, Cain, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Hartman, Hornberger, Ivey, Kaiser, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, Mosby, Patterson, Rose, Shoemaker, Washington, Wilkins
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 25 of 2021
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program to foster job creation and economic development in the State by promoting commercialization of research, facilitating technology transfer, and encouraging small business participation; requiring the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to administer the Program; establishing qualifications for participation in the Program; authorizing the Program to provide certain competitive awards and investments to certain businesses; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0398
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {735967/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/8 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until later this session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Overridden (109-25)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until later today (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Overridden (31-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 25 of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {735967/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Finance 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/8 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until later this session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Overridden (109-25)
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until later today (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Overridden (31-15)
House 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 25 of 2021
Text - Chapter - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
(   10-496 through 10-499, 10-499 through 10-499.5 )
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 10:34 AM
Click to return on the top page