Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Ali, Anderton, Buckel, Ciliberti, Clippinger, Ebersole, Hayes, C. Howard, J. Lewis, Miele, Morgan, Patterson, Queen, Rosenberg, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for 50% of an investment made in a qualified innovation business, not to exceed $50,000, or $100,000 for a qualified investor that is a married couple filing jointly or a pass-through entity; requiring a qualified investor to meet certain requirements in order to be eligible for the credit; requiring the Department of Commerce to administer the credit; applying the Act to certain taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0471 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-746 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM