Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Sensible Sugar in Schools Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, D. Barnes, Fennell, Hornberger, C. Howard, Luedtke, Moon, Patterson, Platt, B. Robinson, Tarlau, and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified county boards to add to a specified wellness policy on or before August 1, 2017, a specified plan for reducing students' added sugar intake per school meal based on specified recommendations; requiring specified county boards to convene a specified workgroup to study the best practices of other jurisdictions regarding methods of lowering students' total sugar intake per school meal; requiring the workgroup to hold at least two public hearings and receive public testimony at each meeting; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-438 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM