Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, Anderson, Bromwell, Brooks, Cluster, Haynes, Jalisi, Lam, McCray, Moon, Morales, Smith, Stein, Vallario, A. Washington, C. Wilson, P. Young, Conaway, Waldstreicher, Kittleman, and B. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that it is lawful under a specified provision of law for a law enforcement officer to intercept a specified oral communication with a specified device under specified circumstances; requiring the Maryland Police Training Commission to develop and publish a specified policy; establishing the Commission Regarding the Implementation and Use of Body Cameras by Law Enforcement Officers; requiring the Commission to submit a report to the Maryland Police Training Commission and the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0628
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {252314/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {213328/2 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {582015/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-11)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {358273/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Astle) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {358273/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {573521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Astle) {223025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Manno) {283423/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {283920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-8)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {252314/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {213328/2 Adopted 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Floor Committee Amendment {582015/1 Adopted 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (129-11) 51
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 4/01/2015 4/01/2015 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {358273/1 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Astle) Adopted 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {358273/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {573521/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Astle) {223025/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Manno) {283423/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {283920/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (128-8) 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:25 AM