Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Barkley, B. Barnes, Brooks, Carr, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Gutierrez, Hayes, Hettleman, Hixson, Kelly, Korman, Lafferty, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Morhaim, Mosby, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Stein, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling in the State a certain expanded polystyrene food service product on or after January 1, 2019; prohibiting certain food service businesses and certain schools from selling or providing food in certain expanded polystyrene food service products on or after January 1, 2019; requiring a county health department to impose certain penalties for violations of the Act; requiring a county health department to notify the Department of the Environment of certain violations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0651
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0229 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2201 through 9-2207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM