Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife Trafficking Prevention
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Atterbeary, Barkley, Carr, Frush, Healey, Hettleman, Holmes, Jalisi, Knotts, Lam, Moon, Morhaim, Platt, S. Robinson, Smith, Stein, and Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from purchasing, selling, offering for sale, or possessing with the intent to sell specified parts or products of specified animal species under specified circumstances, subject to specified exceptions; establishing specified penalties for a violation of the Act; requiring that fines and restitution imposed under the Act be credited to the Department of Natural Resources for the benefit of the Birdwatcher's Fund to be used for the preservation of nongame wildlife species and threatened or endangered species; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0991
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-2A-06.1, 10-2B-01 through 10-2B-10 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM