Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Moon, Acevero, Bartlett, Charkoudian, Charles, D.M. Davis, Ivey, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Smith, Turner, Wilkins, and Crutchfield
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing, from 10 grams to 1 ounce, the amount of marijuana below which possession is a civil offense, rather than a criminal offense; and creating a presumption that a person in possession of less than 1 ounce of marijuana is not in violation of a certain provision of law with regard to marijuana, in the absence of any other evidence of a certain violation.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {722311/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-44)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {722311/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (93-44) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601, 5-601.1, 5-602 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:55 PM