Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Sale and Application of Coal Tar Pavement Products - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, C. Watson, Acevero, Barron, Boyce, Carr, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Hettleman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Solomon, Terrasa, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2021, a person from selling or offering for sale coal tar pavement products or from applying coal tar pavement products to a pavement or a similar surface; and establishing a civil penalty not to exceed $500 for a first offense and not exceeding $1,000 for a second or subsequent offense for certain violations.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0730
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0411 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Sale and Application of Coal Tar Pavement Products - Prohibition
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2301 through 9-2303 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:55 PM