Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Administration – Absentee Ballot Canvass and Moratorium on Use of Wireless Network
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby and Cain
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the time that a local board of elections may begin opening absentee ballot envelopes to canvass the absentee ballots cast in an election to before 9 a.m. on the Friday following election day instead of prior to 8 a.m. on the Wednesday following election day; and prohibiting the use of a wireless wide area network to transmit data from certain electronic poll books to the State Board of Elections or the local boards of elections during an election that is held before January 1, 2021.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0362
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Absentee Ballots – Timing of Canvass
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Delegate Mosby) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Mosby) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {223526/1 (Delegate Mosby) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {834535/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law – Absentee Ballots – Timing of Canvass
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Delegate Mosby) Adopted 40
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Mosby) Adopted 41
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Floor Amendment {223526/1 (Delegate Mosby) Adopted 41
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Election Administration – Absentee Ballot Canvass and Moratorium on Use of Wireless Network
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 42A
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {834535/1 Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 4:30 PM