Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Business and Economic Development Tax Credits – Termination, Alteration, and Evaluation
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Feldmark, Palakovich Carr, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law authorizing and governing a credit against the State income tax for certain expenses incurred for certain cellulosic ethanol technology research and development activities; prohibiting the Secretary of Commerce from designating or expanding certain enterprise zones and focus areas; requiring the Department of Legislative Services to conduct an evaluation of a State tax credit, exemption, or preference, or an aspect of a State tax credit, exemption, or preferences, under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {355862/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (82-47)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Business and Economic Development Tax Credits - Termination
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {355862/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax – Business and Economic Development Tax Credits – Termination, Alteration, and Evaluation
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (82-47) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-1404, 5-702, 5-708, 6-804 )
(   10-721, 10-725, 10-726, 10-732, 10-741, 1-301 through 1-303, 1-304, 1-305, 1-306, 1-307 through 1-310, 1-311 )
(   2013, 2018 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:56 PM
Click to return on the top page