Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of Dwelling
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker, Aumann, Buckel, Folden, Hornberger, Krebs, Malone, Mautz, McComas, Metzgar, Rose, and Saab
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from 2 to 10 the number of years within which a disabled law enforcement officer or rescue worker or the surviving spouse of a fallen law enforcement officer or rescue worker must have acquired specified residential property in order to qualify for a specified property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on the property; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0282
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of Dwelling
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM