Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Restoration Fund – On–Site Sewage Disposal System Grants and Loans – Proof of Income
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Clark, Jackson, Morgan, Rey, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a homeowner to submit a copy of the homeowner's income tax return for the previous taxable year, or a letter from a certified public accountant or tax preparer certifying the homeowner's income as proof of income for a grant or loan to upgrade or repair certain on-site sewage disposal systems.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund – On–Site Sewage Disposal System Grants and Loans – Proof of Income
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1605.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM