Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Beacons
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Carr, Barkley, Chang, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gutierrez, C. Howard, Jackson, Korman, Krimm, Morales, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that a pedestrian hybrid beacon is a traffic control signal; establishing that specified provisions of law do not apply to pedestrian hybrid beacons; authorizing the State Highway Administration or a local jurisdiction to install a pedestrian hybrid beacon in accordance with the federal Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0338
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Signals
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {460514/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Beacons
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 48
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-145.1, 11-168, 21-202, 21-204, 21-204.2, 21-502 )
Last Updated: 11/13/2019 12:52 PM