Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Carr, Carter, Chang, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hammen, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Smith, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, K. Young, P. Young, Zucker, and Queen
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring employers that employ 15 or more employees to provide employees with earned sick and safe leave that is paid at the same rate as the employee normally earns; requiring employers with 14 or fewer employees to provide an employee with unpaid earned sick and safe leave; providing for the manner in which earned sick and safe leave is accrued by the employee and treated by the employer; requiring an employer to allow an employee to use earned sick and safe leave for specified purposes; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0472
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233899/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {713294/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Davis) {713723/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {613426/1 Rejected (53-83)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {973026/1 Rejected (51-83)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {643426/1 Rejected (50-82)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {863928/1 Rejected (52-81)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {783522/1 Rejected (52-81)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {153322/1 Rejected (50-79)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Morgan) {653328/1 Rejected (50-77)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {323925/1 Rejected (51-83)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-54)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {233899/1 Report Adopted 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Davis) Adopted 58
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Committee Amendment {713294/1 Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Davis) {713723/1 Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {613426/1 Rejected (53-83) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {973026/1 Rejected (51-83) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {643426/1 Rejected (50-82) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {863928/1 Rejected (52-81) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {783522/1 Rejected (52-81) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {153322/1 Rejected (50-79) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Morgan) {653328/1 Rejected (50-77) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {323925/1 Rejected (51-83) 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (84-54) 61
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 60
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Szeliga) {153322/01 Rejected
3/31/2016 Amendments House - (Economic Matters) {233899/01 Adopted
4/04/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Kipke) {323925/01 Rejected
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Bromwell) {613426/01 Rejected
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate O'Donnell) {643426/01 Rejected
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Morgan) {653328/01 Rejected
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Economic Matters) {713294/01 Adopted
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Davis) {713723/01 Adopted
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Carozza) {783522/01 Rejected
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Kittleman) {863928/01 Rejected
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Fisher) {973026/01 Rejected
2/03/2016 Text - First - Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
4/04/2016 Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
3/31/2016 Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Bromwell) {613426/1 Rejected (53-83) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Fisher) {973026/1 Rejected (51-83) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (O'Donnell) {643426/1 Rejected (50-82) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {863928/1 Rejected (52-81) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Carozza) {783522/1 Rejected (52-81) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) {153322/1 Rejected (50-79) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Morgan) {653328/1 Rejected (50-77) - 03/27/16
3/28/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Kipke) {323925/1 Rejected (51-83) - 03/28/16
3/29/2016 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (84-54) - 03/29/16
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-106, 3-103, 3-1301 through 3-1311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM