Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Brooks, Kerr, R. Lewis, and Crosby
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting a spouse or financially dependent child of an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces from paying nonresident tuition at a public institution of higher education in the State, subject to documentation that the veteran was discharged honorably at any time; repealing a requirement that certain public institutions of higher education comply with federal law relating to nonresident tuition for veterans and veterans' dependents; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0318
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824563/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {824563/1 Adopted 25
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 27
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/14/2020 10:50 AM