Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Afzali, Adams, Aumann, Carozza, Chang, Ciliberti, Cluster, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Kipke, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, O'Donnell, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Sophocleus, Szeliga, Vogt, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except in specified circumstances, the performance or inducement or attempted performance or inducement of an abortion unless a determination as to the probable age of the unborn child is made by a specified physician; providing that the failure of a physician to perform specified actions is deemed "unprofessional conduct"; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0749
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0492 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-217 through 20-225 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM