Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage - Basis for Rate Determination - Survey Data
Sponsored by
Delegates Adams, Afzali, Arentz, Beitzel, Ghrist, Impallaria, Kittleman, Krebs, Mautz, McConkey, Metzgar, Otto, Rose, West, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Commissioner of Labor and Industry from considering specified wage information from specified projects when making specified annual prevailing wage rate determinations.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0650
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/23/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page