Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on private property on Sundays during the deer muzzle loader season in Dorchester County, subject to certain provisions of law.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0890
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {920612/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-6) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Text - Chapter - Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:33 AM