Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Love, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, K. Young, Brooks, Cardin, Ebersole, Feldmark, Forbes, Guyton, Hettleman, Hill, C. Jackson, Metzgar, and Stein
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2021, the use of Class B fire-fighting foam that contain intentionally added PFAS chemicals for certain testing or training purposes; providing that the Act does not restrict the manufacture, sale, or distribution of certain Class B fire-fighting foam or the discharge or other use of certain fire-fighting foam in emergency fire-fighting or prevention operations; requiring the use of nonfluorinated foam for fire-fighting training; establishing certain penalties; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {766983/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Environment - Use of Fire-Fighting Foam Containing Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances - Prohibition
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {766983/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-1601 through 6-1605 )
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 9:02 AM