Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Tax Fairness Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Acevero, Barve, Carr, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Kaiser, Kelly, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Queen, Reznik, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the manner by which the Comptroller withholds from certain income tax distributions certain amounts that a local government owes to the Local Reserve Account for its share of certain income tax refunds and interest that are paid from the Account related to a certain decision of the U.S. Supreme Court.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County Tax Fairness Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - County Tax Fairness Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - County Tax Fairness Act
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - County Tax Fairness Act
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2015, 2016, 2018 )
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 12:09 PM