Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Standards of Care and Protocol Implementation and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates Gilchrist, Miele, Barkley, Bromwell, Buckel, Carr, Chang, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Healey, Hettleman, Hornberger, Kaiser, Kipke, Kramer, Lam, Long, Luedtke, McComas, McMillan, Metzgar, Morhaim, Patterson, Robinson, Rose, Saab, Vogt, Waldstreicher, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an animal shelter to follow a specified written protocol for reclaiming animals; requiring the Department of Agriculture, on or before January 1, 2018, to adopt specified minimum standards of care for dogs and cats in animal shelters; requiring an animal shelter to follow the minimum standards of care adopted by the Department; and requiring the Department to adopt specified regulations on or before January 1, 2018.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {730116/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-5)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Protocol Implementation and Enforcement
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {730116/1 Adopted 35
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Standards of Care and Protocol Implementation and Enforcement
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (130-5) 37
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 36
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Standards of Care and Protocol Implementation and Enforcement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1701, 2-1704, 2-1705, 2-1706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM