Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Cameras
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Morales, Anderson, Carr, Carter, Korman, Moon, Smith, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement officer to activate both the audio and visual recording capabilities of a body-worn camera under specified circumstances; requiring a specified camera to continue recording until a specified event; providing that the camera may not record an individual engaged in specified activities, with exceptions; providing that a recording made under specified circumstances may not be used to identify specified persons; providing specified requirements for recording on private property under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0482
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:25 AM