Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Primary Care Providers - Adverse Childhood Experiences Screening
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Guyton, Haynes, R. Lewis, and Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Adverse Childhood Experiences Screening Grant Program to provide grants to primary care providers who provide care for minors to implement certain screening tools to identify and treat minors with mental health disorders related to an adverse childhood experience; establishing the Adverse Childhood Experiences Screening Grant Program Fund; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish a course on integrating mental and physical health care in a primary care setting on or before January 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Primary Care Providers - Adverse Childhood Experiences Screening
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-801 through 13-803 )
Last Updated: 2/27/2020 1:04 PM