Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Beidle, Beitzel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Cluster, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, Long, Malone, McComas, McConkey, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Otto, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "sexual abuse" in provisions of law relating to child abuse to include the sex trafficking of a child by any individual; defining the terms "sexual molestation or exploitation" and "sex trafficking" in provisions of law relating to child abuse; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0308
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {182612/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {182612/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Text - Chapter - Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM