Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Elementary and Secondary Education Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Ebersole, and Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Excluding from a subtraction modification certain contributions to and distributions from a certain investment plan that is used for certain elementary and secondary education expenses; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Elementary and Secondary Education Expenses
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207, 10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM