Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement – Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - General Services)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program to be the Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers; requiring the Pricing and Selection Committee to determine the prevailing average market price of certain supplies and services available from Maryland Correctional Enterprises; requiring the Pricing and Selection Committee to review and verify the prevailing average market prices of certain supplies and services; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {496981/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Procedures
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {496981/1 Adopted 46
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement – Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 47A
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Rules 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/13/2020 1:58 PM