Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulation of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles MC/PG 114-15
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to adopt regulations governing the use of off-highway recreational vehicles on Commission property.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {650710/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {650710/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 51
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-207 )
(   11-140.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM