Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Sponsored by
Delegates Shetty, Jalisi, Atterbeary, Bagnall, Brooks, Cain, Cox, D.M. Davis, Dumais, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Hettleman, Johnson, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Solomon, Sydnor, Terrasa, Wilkins, Bartlett, Cardin, Crutchfield, J. Lewis, and R. Watson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the continued detention, beyond emergency detention, of a child under the age of 12 years unless the child is alleged to have committed a certain act that, if committed by an adult, would be a crime of violence or the child is likely to leave the jurisdiction of the court.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {112113/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {112113/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/16/2020 1:02 PM