Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring specified powers and duties of the Comptroller to the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, including the regulation and taxation of alcoholic beverages, cigarettes and other tobacco products, motor carriers, and motor fuel and the regulation of transient vendors; creating a Division of Business Regulation and Taxation in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; authorizing the Secretary to delegate specified powers and duties; creating a Business Regulation and Taxation Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0827
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-102, 10-103, 10-104, 10-201, 10-202, 10-204, 10-206, 10-301, 10-401, 10-402, 10-403, 10-404, 10-504, 10-506, 10-507, 1-101, 1-102, 1-201, 12-102, 12-103, 12-104, 12-107, 12-112, 12-113, 13-101, 14-201, 14-202, 14-203, 14-204, 15-109, 15-112, 15-206, 16-301, 16-302, 16-303, 16-401, 16-404, 16-405, 16-407, 16-407.1, 16-410, 16-506, 2-101, 21-106, 2-202, 2-203, 2-205, 2-206, 2-207, 2-208, 2-209, 2-301, 2-402, 5-501, 6-501, 6-502, 6-503, 6-701, 6-703.2, 7.5-102, 7.5-104, 7.5-107, 7.5-108, 7.5-110, 7.5-111, 7.5-112, 7-101, 8-301, 8-302, 8-306.1, 8-307, 8-308, 8-308.3, 8-310.1, 8-310.2, 8-311, 8-312.1, 8-313.2, 8-314, 8-806, 9-101, 9-104, 9-108, 9-207 )
(   10-101, 10-201, 10-202, 10-203, 10-204, 10-205, 10-302, 10-303, 10-304, 10-304.1, 10-305, 10-306, 10-307, 10-308, 10-309, 10-310, 10-311, 10-314, 10-315, 10-316, 10-317, 10-318, 10-323.1, 10-323.2, 10-401, 10-403, 10-404, 10-405, 10-406, 10-408, 10-410, 10-503, 16.5-101, 16.5-102, 16.5-203, 16.5-204, 16.5-205, 16.5-207, 16.5-208, 16.5-209, 16.5-210, 16.5-211, 16.5-213, 16.5-214, 16.5-215, 16.5-216, 16.5-217, 16-102, 16-201, 16-204, 16-205, 16-206, 16-208, 16-209, 16-210, 16-211, 16-212, 16-213, 16-216, 16-218, 16-219, 16-220, 16-221, 16-222, 16-223, 16-306, 16-307, 16-3B-01, 16-602, 16-602.1, 16-603, 16-604, 16-605, 16-607, 16-609, 17-20A-02, 17-20A-03, 17-20A-04, 2-101, 2-201 through 2-204 )
(   18-213, 18-213.2 )
(   1-101, 12-101, 12-201, 12-202, 12-203, 12-302, 12-303, 12-304, 13-101, 13-104, 13-203, 13-205, 13-206, 13-405, 13-406, 13-408, 13-412, 13-508, 13-509, 13-509.1, 13-701, 13-707, 13-710, 13-711, 13-825, 13-826, 13-834, 13-835, 13-836, 13-837, 13-838, 13-839, 13-840, 13-841, 13-901, 13-905, 2-1001, 2-1002, 2-102, 2-102.1, 2-103.1, 2-104.1, 2-105, 2-105.1, 2-107, 2-108, 2-1101, 2-1102, 2-1601, 2-1602, 2-301, 2-302, 2-303, 5-101, 5-102, 5-104, 5-201, 5-301, 5-303, 9-205, 9-207, 9-208, 9-209, 9-213, 9-214, 9-215, 9-219, 9-220, 9-221, 9-301, 9-303.1, 9-304, 9-308, 9-309, 9-310, 9-318, 9-320, 9-321, 9-322, 9-326, 9-327, 9-328, 9-329, 9-330, 9-331, 9-332, 9-333, 9-335, 9-336, 9-337 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM