Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Remediation of Illegal Dumping - Report
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Anderson, Carter, Conaway, Glenn, Hayes, Lierman, Oaks, B. Robinson, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore City Department of Public Works to report annually to the members of the Baltimore City delegation to the General Assembly on actions taken to remediate illegal dumping in each legislative district during the previous year; and requiring the report to be made available on the Department's Web site.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM