Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Investigation of Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect - Preliminary Report to State's Attorney
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that a local department of social services or law enforcement agency provide a local State's Attorney with a report of the preliminary findings of an investigation of suspected child abuse within 10 days after receiving notice of suspected child abuse.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {882518/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Family Law - Investigation of Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect - Preliminary Report to State's Attorney
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {882518/1 Adopted 45
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Family Law - Investigation of Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect - Preliminary Report to State's Attorney
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Rules 47A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 6:03 PM