Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Household Goods Movers Registration
Sponsored by
Delegates Rogers, Bagnall, Bartlett, Branch, Carey, Chang, Crosby, D.E. Davis, Fennell, Lisanti, McIntosh, Sample-Hughes, C. Watson, Wilson, and Howard
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from providing household goods moving services using a certain commercial motor vehicle in the State unless the person is registered as a household goods mover under the Act; requiring a person to submit to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation a certain application and a certain fee to apply for a certain registration; establishing certain requirements and procedures for the registration of household goods movers under the Act; and requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0712
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Household Goods Movers Registration
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {613593/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Household Goods Movers Registration
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (110-24) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Text - Chapter - Household Goods Movers Registration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8.5-101 through 8.5-107 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:33 AM