Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, P. Young, D. Barnes, Barron, Brooks, Hettleman, Holmes, Jackson, Krimm, Pena-Melnyk, R. Watson, Wilson, Attar, Boyce, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Fraser-Hidalgo, Harrison, Healey, Jalisi, Lehman, Love, Stewart, and Wells
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence to provide grants for housing voucher funds to counties to house homeless veterans and survivors of domestic violence; authorizing the Governor in fiscal year 2020 to include funding in the annual budget for the Program; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to distribute grants to counties and establish grant application procedures; authorizing the Department to establish preferences for certain counties; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0810
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {120612/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {120612/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Text - Chapter - Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
(   4-2501 through 4-2505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page