Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Request for Exhaust Emissions Test After Failing On-Board Diagnostics Test
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, Aumann, Cluster, Impallaria, Krebs, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, and Otto
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a vehicle emissions inspection facility, at the request of the owner of a vehicle that has failed an on-board diagnostics test, to immediately conduct an exhaust emissions test of the vehicle at no cost to the owner of the vehicle; and establishing that a vehicle that passes an exhaust emissions test requested under the Act is deemed to be in compliance with specified emissions standards established for the vehicle.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-201, 23-202, 23-203, 23-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM