Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Hettleman, Ali, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Beidle, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hixson, Holmes, Jackson, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Simonaire, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and Saab
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board of education to extend the length of the school year for up to 5 school days beyond June 15 without approval from the State Board of Education; and requiring a county board to submit a written application to the State Board for permission to increase the length of the school year for more than a certain number of days in accordance with certain provisions of law or to decrease the length of the school year.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - School Year - Completion Date
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {115060/1 Adopted 40
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Parrott) Adopted 40
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Floor Amendment {243627/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Public Schools - School Year - Completion Date
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (125-12) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {204032/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-4) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Text - Chapter - County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM