Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Calculation and Refundability
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Acevero, Carr, Charkoudian, Crosby, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Harrison, Hettleman, Ivey, Kaiser, Lopez, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Proctor, Queen, Rogers, Shetty, Smith, Stewart, and Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow certain individuals without qualifying children to claim an increased credit; allowing certain individuals to claim a refund of the credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0719
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0585 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Calculation and Refundability
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-704 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:01 PM