Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Bagnall, D. Barnes, Bartlett, Cardin, Carey, Charkoudian, Fennell, Guyton, Harrison, Haynes, Hettleman, Holmes, Ivey, C. Jackson, Krebs, Lisanti, Mautz, McComas, Metzgar, Proctor, Qi, Valderrama, Walker, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including income from an individual retirement account or a certain annuity within a certain subtraction modification for certain retirement income if contributions to the individual retirement account or annuity consist entirely of the tax-free rollover of distributions from an employee retirement system; repealing a certain obsolete provision relating to a certain retirement plan; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0014 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:01 PM