Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Carey, Charkoudian, Dumais, Fennell, Lisanti, Qi, Valderrama, C. Watson, and Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the imposition of a maximum number of subscribers to a community solar energy generating system under the Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program; providing for an increase in the generating capacity and capacity limits to be included in the pilot program; altering the termination date of the pilot program to be no sooner than December 31, 2024; and extending to July 1, 2022, the submission date of a certain report on the pilot program to certain committees of the General Assembly.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0520
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-34)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Extension
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Extension
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (100-34) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text - Chapter - Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Extension
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:40 PM