Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County, on or before June 30, 2010, to enter into an agreement with the owner of a specified economic development project that provides a specified economic benefit for a payment in lieu of the county real and personal property tax; authorizing the owner of the economic development project and the county to modify the payment in lieu of taxes agreement entered into on or before June 30, 2020, under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0930
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {565969/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {565969/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page