Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Highway Construction - Storm Drains - Covers and Task Force on Preventing Debris From Entering Storm Drains
Sponsored by
Delegate Impallaria
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that any new or replacement storm drain cover installed on a street or highway in the State prevent debris larger than 1 inch in height or circumference from passing through the storm drain; establishing the Task Force on Preventing Debris From Entering Storm Drains; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Highway Construction - Storm Drains - Covers and Task Force on Preventing Debris From Entering Storm Drains
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/6/2020 1:55 PM