Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Angel, B. Barnes, Barve, Branch, Carr, Carter, Chang, Clippinger, Cullison, Davis, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gilchrist, Hammen, Hill, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jones, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Krebs, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Program that recognizes public high school graduates in the State who have attained proficiency in speaking, reading, and writing in one or more languages in addition to English; providing that participation in the Program by a local school system is voluntary; providing that, beginning with the graduating class of 2017, eligible students shall receive a Seal of Biliteracy affixed to a diploma or transcript under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0781
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0166 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-5)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-5) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM